American Autowash, LLC et al v. Foam Zone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Autowash Express, LLC, American Autowash, LLC and Foam Zone, LLC
Defendant: Virginia College, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00518
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Injunctive Relief in Another District by Virginia College, LLC (Bickle, Brandon)
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Temporary Injunctive Relief in Another District by Virginia College, LLC (Bickle, Brandon)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Curtis J Thomas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thomas, Curtis)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Education Corporation of America for Virginia College, LLC) by Virginia College, LLC (Bickle, Brandon)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Motion for Miscellaneous Relief); Correction: changed event (Motion for Hearing) (Re: #9 MOTION for Hearing ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing [Plaintiffs' Application for Emergency Status Conference] by American Autowash Express, LLC, American Autowash, LLC, Foam Zone, LLC (Thomas, Curtis) Modified on 10/10/2018 to change event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Autowash Express, LLC, American Autowash, LLC, Foam Zone, LLC (Thomas, Curtis)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event (Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); this is a multi-part motion of which only one part was efiled; Correction: corrected event (Motion for Hearing) and efiled Motion to Remand at dkt # 7 (Re: #5 MOTION for Hearing ) (srt, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Virginia College, LLC, American Autowash Express, LLC, American Autowash, LLC, Foam Zone, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand (submitted as dkt #5 by American Autowash Express, LLC, American Autowash, LLC, Foam Zone, LLC (srt, Dpty Clk)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing (Emergency) by American Autowash Express, LLC, American Autowash, LLC, Foam Zone, LLC (With attachments) (Thomas, Curtis) Modified on 10/9/2018 - to correct event. This is a multi-part motion of which only one part was efiled - see Motion to Remand dkt # 7 (srt, Dpty Clk).
October 8, 2018 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Virginia College, LLC (Bickle, Brandon)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Virginia College, LLC (Bickle, Brandon)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2018-3939 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1968077) by Virginia College, LLC (With attachments) (Bickle, Brandon)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Virginia College, LLC (Bickle, Brandon)
September 24, 2018 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Virginia College, LLC by American Autowash, LLC, American Autowash Express, LLC, Foam Zone, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Autowash, LLC et al v. Foam Zone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Autowash Express, LLC
Represented By: Curtis J Thomas
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Autowash, LLC
Represented By: Curtis J Thomas
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foam Zone, LLC
Represented By: Curtis J Thomas
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia College, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Craig Bickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?