Pierce v. Receivable Management Services LLC, The

Plaintiff: Jessica Pierce
Defendant: Receivable Management Services LLC, The
Case Number: 4:2018cv00525
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #7 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Jessica Pierce (Wandres, Victor)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell The Court is in receipt of the Notice of Settlement (Doc. 5). Dismissal papers shall be filed on or before January 4, 2019., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 1/4/2019) (Re: #5 Notice of Settlement ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Jessica Pierce (Wandres, Victor)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Receivable Management Services LLC, The (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jessica Pierce (With attachments) (Wandres, Victor)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Receivable Management Services LLC, The (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Receivable Management Services LLC, The (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1969420) by Jessica Pierce (Wandres, Victor)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jessica Pierce (Wandres, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Receivable Management Services LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivable Management Services LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Pierce
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?