United States of America v. Brannan et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Earl B Brannan, Lawanda S Brannan, Stoops & LA Course, PLLC, Jonathan S Brannan, First United Bank & Trust Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 4:2018cv00572
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting relief under Local Civil Rule 83.3(c) ; granting #10 Motion for Relief (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Relief Under Local Civil Rule 83.3(c) and Brief in Support by JP Morgan Chase Bank (Rodine, Brent)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank) by JP Morgan Chase Bank (Rodine, Brent)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by JP Morgan Chase Bank (Rodine, Brent)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brent Jason Rodine on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank [Note: Attorney Brent Jason Rodine added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank(pty:dft).] (Rodine, Brent)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Lawanda S Brannan (Crook, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Crook on behalf of Lawanda S Brannan [Note: Attorney Matthew Thomas Crook added to party Lawanda S Brannan(pty:dft).] (Crook, Matthew)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Earl B Brannan, Jonathan S Brannan, Lawanda S Brannan, First United Bank & Trust Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, Stoops & La Course, PLLC (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Julian Todd Lee (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America (Lee, Julian)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Lee, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Brannan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl B Brannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawanda S Brannan
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoops & LA Course, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan S Brannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First United Bank & Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Brent Jason Rodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julian Todd Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?