United States of America v. Four (4) Firearms and One Hundred Fifty Two Rounds of Assorted Ammunition
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Four (4) Firearms and One Hundred Fifty Two Rounds of Assorted Ammunition
Claimant: Derek Braswell
Case Number: 4:2019cv00062
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/24/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Derek Braswell (Monroe, Stanley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 CLAIM by Derek Braswell [Note: Attorney Stanley Dwight Monroe added to party Derek Braswell(pty:dft).] (Monroe, Stanley)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT Returned by United States of America (Depew, Catherine)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT Issued by Court Clerk (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Plaintiff's Application for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in Rem ; granting #7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America (Depew, Catherine)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Catherine J Depew on behalf of United States of America (Depew, Catherine)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; sealing document(s); granting #3 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Re: #4 Sealed Document ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT (Depew, Catherine)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Affidavit of Senior Special Agent Brett Williams by United States of America (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America For Forfeiture In Rem by United States of America (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Four (4) Firearms and One Hundred Fifty Two Rounds of Assorted Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four (4) Firearms and One Hundred Fifty Two Rounds of Assorted Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Catherine J Depew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Derek Braswell
Represented By: Stanley Dwight Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?