United States of America v. Drummond Ranch LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gentner Drummond, Bluestem Aerial Sprayers, LLC, Drummond Ranch LLC and Regier Flying Service, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00077
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Gentner Drummond ; (Gaskins, Garry)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 5/2/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by United States of America ; (With attachments) (Hardcastle, Marianne)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Drummond Ranch LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Drummond Ranch LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #3 Complaint ) by Drummond Ranch LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Garry Michael Gaskins, II on behalf of Drummond Ranch LLC [Note: Attorney Garry Michael Gaskins, II added to party Drummond Ranch LLC(pty:dft).] (Gaskins, Garry)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bluestem Aerial Sprayers, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER (Re: #3 Complaint ) by Bluestem Aerial Sprayers, LLC (Hall, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bluestem Aerial Sprayers, LLC (Hall, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott Robert Hall on behalf of Bluestem Aerial Sprayers, LLC [Note: Attorney Scott Robert Hall added to party Bluestem Aerial Sprayers, LLC(pty:dft).] (Hall, Scott)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gentner Drummond (With attachments) (Gaskins, Garry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Garry Michael Gaskins, II on behalf of Gentner Drummond [Note: Attorney Garry Michael Gaskins, II added to party Gentner Drummond(pty:dft).] (Gaskins, Garry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Gentner Drummond (Re: #3 Complaint ) by United States of America (Hardcastle, Marianne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Drummond Ranch LLC (Re: #3 Complaint ) by United States of America (Hardcastle, Marianne)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bluestem Aerial Sprayers, LLC (Re: #3 Complaint ) by United States of America (Hardcastle, Marianne)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Judge Terence Kern. Judge John E Dowdell reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-cv-77-JED-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by United States of America (Hardcastle, Marianne)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Hardcastle, Marianne)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Marianne Smith Hardcastle on behalf of United States of America (Hardcastle, Marianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Drummond Ranch LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentner Drummond
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluestem Aerial Sprayers, LLC
Represented By: Scott Robert Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drummond Ranch LLC
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regier Flying Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Marianne Smith Hardcastle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?