Rittenhouse v Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Stereo Supersonic Music, Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc., Jordan Rocks Music, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Lit Up Music, WB Music Corp. and Patricia Rittenhouse
Defendant: Fur Shop LLC and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00104
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; terminating attorney James Wesley Scott Pebsworth ; granting #12 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Life Insurance Company of North America (Pebsworth, James)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 5/16/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Life Insurance Company of North America (Stewart, Leasa)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Life Insurance Company of North America to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company for Life Insurance Company of North America) by Life Insurance Company of North America (Pebsworth, James)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that defendant's unopposed motion #5 is granted. Defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading no later than 4/16/19 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 4/16/2019); granting #5 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leasa M Stewart on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America [Note: Attorney Leasa M Stewart added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft).] (Stewart, Leasa)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Answer or Otherwise Plead to (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Life Insurance Company of North America (Pebsworth, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Wesley Scott Pebsworth on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America [Note: Attorney James Wesley Scott Pebsworth added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft).] (Pebsworth, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Life Insurance Company of North America (dlg, Dpty Clk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2021278) by Patricia Rittenhouse (Shook, Jonathan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Patricia Rittenhouse (Shook, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rittenhouse v Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stereo Supersonic Music
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Rocks Music
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Vaughan Music, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lit Up Music
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Rittenhouse
Represented By: Jonathan Everett Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fur Shop LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Leasa M Stewart
Represented By: James Wesley Scott Pebsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?