Yang v. Green Country Chiropractic et al
Plaintiff: Maishoua Yang
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, The, Green Country Chiropractic, IRS and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00236
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 10/10/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2019, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/24/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Nonjury Trial set for 1/27/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America (Smith, Casey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: #9 Counterclaim ) by Maishoua Yang (Truskett, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 CROSS-CLAIM against Green Country Chiropractic by United States of America (Smith, Casey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 COUNTERCLAIM against Maishoua Yang by United States of America (Smith, Casey)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/10/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by United States of America (Smith, Casey)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by United States of America (Smith, Casey)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The Court Clerk is directed to substitute United States of America in place of defendant Internal Revenue Service, as per footnote 1 of defendant USA's notice of removal (Dkt. # 2). The parties are directed to correct the case caption accordingly on future pleadings., adding party United States of America terminating party Internal Revenue Service, The (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) by Internal Revenue Service, The (Smith, Casey)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2017-1620 by Internal Revenue Service, The (With attachments) (Smith, Casey)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Internal Revenue Service, The (Smith, Casey)
March 28, 2019 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Green Country Chiropractic, Internal Revenue Service, The by Maishoua Yang (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. Green Country Chiropractic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, The
Represented By: Casey Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Country Chiropractic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Represented By: Casey Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Casey Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maishoua Yang
Represented By: John Paul Truskett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?