Patel et al v. United States of America
Petitioner: Savitaben Patel and Ishverbhai Patel
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00240
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) (see document number #18 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Freeman, Jason)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/20/2019, Replies due by 7/4/2019); granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel ; (Lile, Sloane)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V. Eagan, referring case to Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy for all further proceedings in accordance with his jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636 (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): (No Reply allowed) ( Responses due by 5/24/2019) (Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) by United States of America [Note: Attorney Gretchen Ellen Nygaard added to party United States of America(pty:res).] (Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service Internal Revenue Service by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane)
May 6, 2019 ***Remark: Paper copy of previous entry mailed to attorney Jason B Freeman per the manual noticing instructions on the receipt (Re: Case Converted to a Civil Case ) (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 6, 2019 ***This Miscellaneous case has been converted to civil case 19-cv-240-CVE-FHM. All further documents should reflect the civil case number and be filed in the civil case. (jln, Dpty Clk)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (tjc, Dpty Clk)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Frank H. McCarthy (Re: #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason Brent Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2038319) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason Brent Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2038319) by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (With attachments) (Lile, Sloane)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service Attorney General of the United States by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service R. Trent Shores, US Attorney by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America (jln, Dpty Clk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sloane Ryan Lile on behalf of Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Addison Shank on behalf of Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Shank, Andrew)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (With attachments) (Shank, Andrew)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Shank, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Ellen Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Savitaben Patel
Represented By: Jason B Freeman
Represented By: Sloane Ryan Lile
Represented By: Andrew Addison Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ishverbhai Patel
Represented By: Jason B Freeman
Represented By: Sloane Ryan Lile
Represented By: Andrew Addison Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?