Patel et al v. United States of America
Petitioner: Shailesh Patel and Hina Patel
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00241
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2048223) ) (see document number #9 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Hina Patel, Shailesh Patel (Freeman, Jason)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V. Eagan, referring case to Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne for all further proceedings in accordance with his jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636 (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; adding attorney Jason B Freeman for Hina Patel,Jason B Freeman for Shailesh Patel ; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason B. Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2050680) ) (RGG, Chambers)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason B. Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2050680) by Hina Patel, Shailesh Patel (With attachments) (Shank, Andrew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 6, 2019 ***This Miscellaneous case has been converted to civil case 19-cv-241-CVE-JFJ. All further documents should reflect the civil case number and be filed in the civil case. (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sloane Ryan Lile on behalf of Hina Patel, Shailesh Patel (Lile, Sloane)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Addison Shank on behalf of Hina Patel, Shailesh Patel (Shank, Andrew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2048223) by Hina Patel, Shailesh Patel (With attachments) (Shank, Andrew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hina Patel, Shailesh Patel (Shank, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shailesh Patel
Represented By: Sloane Ryan Lile
Represented By: Andrew Addison Shank
Represented By: Jason B Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hina Patel
Represented By: Sloane Ryan Lile
Represented By: Andrew Addison Shank
Represented By: Jason B Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?