Grogan et al v. Renfrow
Appellant: Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco and Courtney Grogan
Appellee: Miranda Kristin Renfrow
Case Number: 4:2019cv00248
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; denying #9 Motion to Stay (tjc, Dpty Clk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Motion Hearing held on 06-06-2019 before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Court Reporter: Greg Bloxom (918.699.4878)) (Pages: 1 - 27). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the court public terminal at no charge or may purchase a copy from the court reporter. (Re: #16 Minutes of Motion Hearing,, Taking Motion(s) Under Advisement,, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), ) (tgb, Crt Rptr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court ) by Miranda Kristin Renfrow ; (Freeman, Ronnie)
June 12, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , setting/resetting bankruptcy appeal briefing deadline(s): ( Appellants Brief due by 7/17/2019, Appellees Brief due by 8/21/2019, Appellants Reply Brief due by 9/11/2019) (jln, Dpty Clk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 RECORD ON APPEAL from Bankruptcy Court (Re: #2 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court ) (With attachments) (jln, Dpty Clk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court ) by Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco, Courtney Grogan ; (With attachments) (Quillin, Paula)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion ) by Miranda Kristin Renfrow (Freeman, Ronnie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2019 , taking motion(s) under advisement, striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Re: #9 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal and To fix the Amount of Supersedeas Bond ) (Court Reporter: c2) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Miranda Kristin Renfrow (Freeman, Ronnie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT Authority Regarding Motion to Stay (Re: #11 Brief in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal and To fix the Amount of Supersedeas Bond ) by Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco, Courtney Grogan (With attachments) (Quillin, Paula)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal and To fix the Amount of Supersedeas Bond ) by Miranda Kristin Renfrow ; (Freeman, Ronnie)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Courtroom #2, 3rd floor) ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy); granting #10 Motion for Hearing (Re: #9 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal and To fix the Amount of Supersedeas Bond ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal and To fix the Amount of Supersedeas Bond ) by Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco, Courtney Grogan ; (With attachments) (Farris, Joseph)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing (Re: #9 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal and To fix the Amount of Supersedeas Bond ) by Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco, Courtney Grogan (Farris, Joseph)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal and To fix the Amount of Supersedeas Bond by Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco, Courtney Grogan (With attachments) (Farris, Joseph)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paula J Quillin on behalf of Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco, Courtney Grogan [Note: Attorney Paula J Quillin added to party Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco(pty:a), Attorney Paula J Quillin added to party Courtney Grogan (pty:a).] (Quillin, Paula)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ronald D Brown on behalf of Miranda Kristin Renfrow [Note: Attorney Ronald D Brown added to party Miranda Kristin Renfrow(pty:e).] (Brown, Ronald)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ronnie Jack Freeman on behalf of Miranda Kristin Renfrow [Note: Attorney Ronnie Jack Freeman added to party Miranda Kristin Renfrow(pty:e).] (Freeman, Ronnie)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, changing case number to 19-CV-248-TCK-FHM, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy, Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne no longer assigned to case (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco (Ary, Jennifer)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEAL from Bankruptcy Court by Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco, Courtney Grogan (With attachments) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco, Courtney Grogan (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 5/9/2019 to correct file date (dlg, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grogan et al v. Renfrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Glass & Fiasco
Represented By: Jennifer Dawn Ary
Represented By: Neal Edward Tomlins
Represented By: Joseph R Farris
Represented By: Paula J Quillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Courtney Grogan
Represented By: Jennifer Dawn Ary
Represented By: Neal Edward Tomlins
Represented By: Joseph R Farris
Represented By: Paula J Quillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Miranda Kristin Renfrow
Represented By: Joel A LaCourse
Represented By: Ron Brown
Represented By: Gregory T Colpitts
Represented By: Greggory Thomas Colpitts
Represented By: Ronald D Brown
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?