Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The v. Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The
Defendant: Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00249
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #24 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Hobbs, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/5/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica)
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn John Bowman on behalf of Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jessica Lynn John Bowman added to party Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Bowman, Jessica)
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Blue on behalf of Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. [Note: Attorney Rachel Blue added to party Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Blue, Rachel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D Hobbs, Jr on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Hobbs, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kaitlyn A Haase on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Haase, Kaitlyn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M Bowler on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Bowler, John)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (re Attys Michael D. Hobbs, Jr., Kaitlyn A. Haase, and John M. Bowler for plaintiff) ; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) John M. Bowler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2052875) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kaitlyn A. Haase to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2052870) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael D. Hobbs, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2052834) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 MAIL to Kaitlyn A Haase Returned - remailed on 5/13/19 to 600 Peachtreet ST NE Ste 3000, Atlanta, GA 30308-2216 - new address obtained from the USPS. (Re: 4 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 MAIL to John M Bowler Returned - remailed on 5/13/19 to 600 Peachtree ST NE Ste 3000, Atlanta, GA 30308-2216 - new adress obtained from USPS. (Re: 4 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent American Tire Distributors, Inc. for Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Hercules Tire & Rubber Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher A Barrow on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hercules Tire Sales, Inc., The (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2051294) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) Modified on 5/10/2019 to correct "against" party text (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The v. Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The
Represented By: Kaitlyn A Haase
Represented By: John M Bowler
Represented By: Christopher A Barrow
Represented By: Michael D Hobbs, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Blue
Represented By: Jessica Lynn John Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?