Sullivan v. Rangitsch et al

Plaintiff: Deidra Sullivan
Defendant: Mark Rangitsch, Mercy Hospital Joplin and DHP of Missouri, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00257
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/8/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mercy Hospital Joplin (Moody, Charles)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Mercy Health for Mercy Hospital Joplin) by Mercy Hospital Joplin (Moody, Charles)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles H Moody on behalf of Mercy Hospital Joplin [Note: Attorney Charles H Moody added to party Mercy Hospital Joplin(pty:dft).] (Moody, Charles)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DHP of Missouri, P.C. (With attachments) (Krieger, Lane)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DHP of Missouri, P.C. (Krieger, Lane)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lane Odell Krieger on behalf of DHP of Missouri, P.C. [Note: Attorney Lane Odell Krieger added to party DHP of Missouri, P.C.(pty:dft).] (Krieger, Lane)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: DHP of Missouri, P.C. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Deidra Sullivan (Smolen, Donald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Mercy Hospital Joplin (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Deidra Sullivan (Smolen, Donald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Mark Rangitsch (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Deidra Sullivan (Smolen, Donald)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to DHP of Missouri, P.C., Mercy Hospital Joplin, Mark Rangitsch (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DHP of Missouri, P.C., Mercy Hospital Joplin, Mark Rangitsch (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2052651) by Deidra Sullivan (Smolen, Donald)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Deidra Sullivan (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Rangitsch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rangitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Hospital Joplin
Represented By: Charles H Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHP of Missouri, P.C.
Represented By: Lane Odell Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidra Sullivan
Represented By: James Francis Kelly
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?