Panepinto v. Compression Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Panepinto and William Hargrove
Defendant: Compression Solutions, LLC and BSN, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00259
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/8/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
July 6, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, IV, V, VI, VII, and VIII of the Amended Complaint ) by William Hargrove, James Panepinto ; [Note: Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party William Hargrove(pty:pla), Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party James Panepinto(pty:pla).] (Hamilton, Laura)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J Daniel Weidner on behalf of BSN, Inc., Compression Solutions, LLC (Weidner, J)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Compression Solutions, LLC, and BSN, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; adding attorney J Daniel Weidner for BSN, Inc.,J Daniel Weidner for Compression Solutions, LLC ; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) J. Daniel Weidner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2068464) by BSN, Inc., Compression Solutions, LLC (With attachments) (Lohrke, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Essity North America, Inc., Corporate Parent BSN CS, Inc., Corporate Parent BSN Medical, Inc. for Compression Solutions, LLC) by Compression Solutions, LLC (Lohrke, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Essity North America, Inc. for BSN, Inc.) by BSN, Inc. (Lohrke, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, IV, V, VI, VII, and VIII of the Amended Complaint ) by BSN, Inc., Compression Solutions, LLC ; (Lohrke, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, IV, V, VI, VII, and VIII of the Amended Complaint by BSN, Inc., Compression Solutions, LLC (Lohrke, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mary Lynn Lohrke on behalf of BSN, Inc., Compression Solutions, LLC [Note: Attorney Mary Lynn Lohrke added to party BSN, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Lynn Lohrke added to party Compression Solutions, LLC(pty:dft).] (Lohrke, Mary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Compression Solutions, LLC (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by James Panepinto (Smolen, Donald)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: BSN, Inc. (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by James Panepinto (Smolen, Donald)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by James Panepinto, William Hargrove [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party William Hargrove(pty:pla).] (Smolen, Donald)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Judge Claire V Eagan. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-CV-259-TCK-FHM (pll, Dpty Clk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 5/14/2019 - ENTERED IN ERROR - see #4 for correct entry(sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BSN, Inc., Compression Solutions, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2052945) by James Panepinto (Smolen, Donald)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by James Panepinto (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panepinto v. Compression Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compression Solutions, LLC
Represented By: J Daniel Weidner
Represented By: Mary Lynn Lohrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSN, Inc.
Represented By: J Daniel Weidner
Represented By: Mary Lynn Lohrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Panepinto
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: James David Sicking, Jr
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hargrove
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?