Mathieu v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: James J Mathieu
Defendant: Austin Brown, Mark Schantz, Roger County Court Clerk Office and Rogers County Court Clerk Office
Case Number: 4:2019cv00262
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 19-5061 #10 (Re: #10 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY RECORD Sent to Circuit Court (Re: #10 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 7/10/2019 to restrict access to case participants as this record includes the Notice of Appeal previously restricted (srt, Dpty Clk).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , : Due to the inclusion of personal identifiers and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(e)(2), the Court hereby, for good cause, restricts remote electronic access to Document #10 to registered case participants. If a future filing in this case contains personal identifiers, the Court may impose the same restrictions on said filing pursuant to this order. (Re: #10 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court (Re: #8 Minute Order,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,, #9 Judgment,, Dismissing/Terminating Case ) by James J Mathieu (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 7/2/2019 to restrict PDF, as directed by the court and per Minute Order #11 (dlg, Dpty Clk).
May 23, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #9 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Judge Claire V Eagan (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL), dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) (Re: #8 Minute Order,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. # 1) is granted. Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. # 2) is dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Re: #2 Complaint, #1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS., 6 Minute Order, Changing Case Number ) (RGG, Chambers) Modified on 5/24/2019 to change text to reflect correct event and change text to correctly reflect dkt # which was granted (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing the Court Clerk to correct the spelling of named defendant to "Rogers County Court Clerk Office." (Re: #5 Case Transferred from Another District, #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 19-cv-00262-CVE-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from New York Southern 1:19-cv-4073-CM
May 10, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, to James J. Mathieu 7942 Gates St. Houston, TX 77028. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Oklahoma. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #4 Order to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER. Venue lies in the Northern District of Oklahoma, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and the Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/9/2019) (rjm). Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from James J. Mathieu re: I"m formally writing to request that you transfer my complaint to the proper court having jurisdiction over the matters within my complaint. Document filed by James J. Mathieu.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Austin Brown, Roger County Court Clerk Office, Mark Schantz. Document filed by James J. Mathieu.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by James J. Mathieu.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathieu v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Schantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger County Court Clerk Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers County Court Clerk Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J Mathieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?