R.P. Small Corp. v. Kadakia
Plaintiff: R.P. Small Corp.
Defendant: Ruchir A Kadakia
Case Number: 4:2019cv00271
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 8) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due August 29, 2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/29/2019); granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Ruchir A Kadakia (Vincent, Evan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Grant Ellis Vincent on behalf of Ruchir A Kadakia [Note: Attorney Evan Grant Ellis Vincent added to party Ruchir A Kadakia(pty:dft).] (Vincent, Evan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sanford C Coats on behalf of Ruchir A Kadakia [Note: Attorney Sanford C Coats added to party Ruchir A Kadakia(pty:dft).] (Coats, Sanford)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ruchir A Kadakia (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing R.P. Small Corp. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R.P. Small Corp. (Blackstock, Roger)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by R.P. Small Corp. (Blackstock, Roger)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ruchir A Kadakia (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2055594) by R.P. Small Corp. (Blackstock, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.P. Small Corp. v. Kadakia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruchir A Kadakia
Represented By: Evan Grant Ellis Vincent
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.P. Small Corp.
Represented By: Lacey Lynn Shirley
Represented By: Roger Brent Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?