Warren American Oil Company, LLC v. Ace American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Warren American Oil Company, LLC
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company and Fred Daniels and Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00274
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply ) by Warren American Oil Company, LLC ; (Edmonds, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Ace American Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #17 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by Warren American Oil Company, LLC ; (With attachments) (Maguire, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #17 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by Ace American Insurance Company ; (With attachments) (Stiner, John)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Postpone Joint Status Report (Doc. 19) is GRANTED. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report within thirty (30) days of this Court ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 17). ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #19 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Postpone Joint Status Report Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Brief in Support (Re: #9 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) by Warren American Oil Company, LLC (Edmonds, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Fred Daniels and Sons, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Warren American Oil Company, LLC (McClellan, Wynoka)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Wynoka Middleton McClellan on behalf of Warren American Oil Company, LLC [Note: Attorney Wynoka Middleton McClellan added to party Warren American Oil Company, LLC(pty:pla).] (McClellan, Wynoka)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley Ann Janzen on behalf of Warren American Oil Company, LLC [Note: Attorney Ashley Ann Janzen added to party Warren American Oil Company, LLC(pty:pla).] (Janzen, Ashley)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent LIAM Holdings, Inc. for Warren American Oil Company, LLC) by Warren American Oil Company, LLC (Edmonds, James)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 JURY DEMAND by Fred Daniels and Sons, Inc. (McKenna, Bruce)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Fred Daniels and Sons, Inc. (McKenna, Bruce)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fred Daniels and Sons, Inc. (McKenna, Bruce)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bruce Alvin McKenna on behalf of Fred Daniels and Sons, Inc. (McKenna, Bruce)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/28/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Ace American Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Warren American Oil Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ace American Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace American Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Douglas Stiner on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Ace American Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Osage Co., Okla., case number CJ-2019-78 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2056535) by Ace American Insurance Company (With attachments) (Stiner, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ace American Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
April 17, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Ace American Insurance Company, Fred Daniels and Sons, Inc. by Warren American Oil Company, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren American Oil Company, LLC v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren American Oil Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark William Maguire
Represented By: James Newton Edmonds
Represented By: Ashley Ann Janzen
Represented By: Wynoka Middleton McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Daniels and Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Alvin McKenna
Represented By: Gregory Raeburn McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?