Stevens v. Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma
Plaintiff: Char Stevens
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2019cv00277
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 ***Remark: Case transferred from Oklahoma Northern has been opened in Eastern District of Oklahoma as case 6:19-cv-00177, filed 06/05/2019. (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
June 4, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #9 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; transferring case (terminates case) ; granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District - Eastern District of Oklahoma by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/19/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre Camille Gooch on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Ambre Camille Gooch added to party Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Gooch, Ambre)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Lee Carr on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number CJ-19-0137 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2056340) by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (With attachments) (Carr, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma (Carr, Michael)
April 25, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma by Char Stevens (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Char Stevens
Represented By: Jean Walpole Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Wagoner County, State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Michael Lee Carr
Represented By: Ambre Camille Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?