Rimes v. MVT Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Morris E Rimes, Jr
Defendant: MVT Services, LLC and Cecilio Portillo
Case Number: 4:2019cv00282
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, ) by Morris E Rimes, Jr (Self, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint, #11 Answer, #6 Answer ) by MVT Services, LLC, Cecilio Portillo (Ary, Jennifer)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support ) by Morris E Rimes, Jr ; (With attachments) (Self, James) Modified on 7/10/2019 to seal PDF of Attachment 1 as it was filed unredacted; counsel will file the redacted version using the Errata/Correction event. (jln, Dpty Clk).
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent MVT Holdings LLC for MVT Services, LLC) by MVT Services, LLC (Ary, Jennifer)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer Dawn Ary on behalf of Cecilio Portillo [Note: Attorney Jennifer Dawn Ary added to party Cecilio Portillo(pty:dft).] (Ary, Jennifer)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing MVT Services, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Cecilio Portillo (Goodnight, Jason)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Goodnight on behalf of Cecilio Portillo [Note: Attorney Jason Goodnight added to party Cecilio Portillo(pty:dft).] (Goodnight, Jason)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/22/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Goodnight on behalf of MVT Services, LLC [Note: Attorney Jason Goodnight added to party MVT Services, LLC(pty:dft).] (Goodnight, Jason)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support by MVT Services, LLC (Ary, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by MVT Services, LLC (Ary, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer Dawn Ary on behalf of MVT Services, LLC [Note: Attorney Jennifer Dawn Ary added to party MVT Services, LLC(pty:dft).] (Ary, Jennifer)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to MVT Services, LLC, Cecilio Portillo (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James F Self, Jr on behalf of Morris E Rimes, Jr (Self, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2057856) by Morris E Rimes, Jr (Self, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Morris E Rimes, Jr (Self, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rimes v. MVT Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris E Rimes, Jr
Represented By: James F Self, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVT Services, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Dawn Ary
Represented By: Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilio Portillo
Represented By: Jennifer Dawn Ary
Represented By: Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?