NGL Energy Partners, LP v. Blitz Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NGL Energy Partners, LP
Defendant: Borsheim Crane Service, LLC, Influx Capital, LLC, Addy Source, LLC, Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC, SPG Advance, LLC, United States of America, RDL Excavation & Construction, LLC, Blitz Energy Services, LLC and Borshem Crane Service, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Harold Kessler
Case Number: 4:2019cv00297
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Blitz Energy Services, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 36 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #32 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #31 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #30 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #29 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Borsheim Crane Service, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against SPG Advance, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Influx Capital, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Addy Source, LLC by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blitz Energy Services, LLC (Hoch, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing RDL Excavation & Construction, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by RDL Excavation & Construction, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: SPG Advance, LLC (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Addy Source, LLC (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted re: SPG Advance, LLC (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted re: Addy Source, LLC (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Borshem Crane Service, LLC (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: RDL Excavation & Construction, LLC (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #10 MOTION for ancillary Receivership status (filed in State Court) ) by Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC ; (Powell, Courtney)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Shannon F Davies on behalf of Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC (Davies, Shannon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent UMB Bank, Corporate Parent UMB Financial Corporation for Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC) by Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC (Powell, Courtney)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC (Powell, Courtney)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtney Jo Davis Powell on behalf of Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC (Powell, Courtney)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #10 MOTION for ancillary Receivership status (filed in State Court) ) by NGL Energy Partners, LP ; (Duren, Dylan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) ) by NGL Energy Partners, LP ; (Duren, Dylan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Oppenheimer Funds, Inc. for NGL Energy Partners, LP) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (Duren, Dylan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing NGL Energy Partners, LP to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2019-1803 by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared)
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Wiesner, Jared)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion (filed in State Court) (Re: #8 MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) ) by Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC ; (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 6/4/2019 to edit docket text (dlg, Dpty Clk).
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for ancillary Receivership status (filed in State Court) by Harold Kessler (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (filed in State Court) (Re: #8 MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) ) by Harold Kessler ; (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Deposit/Invest Funds (filed in State Court) by NGL Energy Partners, LP (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 1, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by NGL Energy Partners, LP (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NGL Energy Partners, LP v. Blitz Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borsheim Crane Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Influx Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addy Source, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Jo Davis Powell
Represented By: Shannon F Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPG Advance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jared Scott Wiesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDL Excavation & Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blitz Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: William H Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borshem Crane Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NGL Energy Partners, LP
Represented By: Dylan Tyler Duren
Represented By: Tracy Wayne Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Harold Kessler
Represented By: William H Hoch
Represented By: Jordan Sessler
Represented By: Elliot Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?