Foreman v. Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elsie Foreman
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC and Toyota Motor Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00360
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Toyota Motor Corporation (Kaufmann, Linda)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Toyota Motor Corporation (Kaufmann, Linda)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Linda Gensler Kaufmann on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation [Note: Attorney Linda Gensler Kaufmann added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft).] (Kaufmann, Linda)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura Lea Eakens on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation [Note: Attorney Laura Lea Eakens added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft).] (Eakens, Laura)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Allen Jennings, III on behalf of Toyota Motor Corporation [Note: Attorney James Allen Jennings, III added to party Toyota Motor Corporation(pty:dft).] (Jennings, James)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC (Bruce, Richard)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Toyota Motor North America, Inc., (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Elsie Foreman (Hays, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC, Toyota Motor Corporation (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Elsie Foreman (Hays, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC (Bruce, Richard)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC (Bruce, Richard)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Richard A Bruce on behalf of Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC [Note: Attorney Richard A Bruce added to party Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC(pty:dft).] (Bruce, Richard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel Charles Hays on behalf of Elsie Foreman (Hays, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-207151) by Elsie Foreman (Hays, Daniel) Modified on 7/3/2019 to add receipt number (sc, Dpty Clk).
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Elsie Foreman (Hays, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreman v. Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Foreman
Represented By: Daniel Charles Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fletcher Automotive No. 7, LLC
Represented By: Richard A Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Represented By: James Allen Jennings, III
Represented By: Linda Gensler Kaufmann
Represented By: Laura Lea Eakens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?