City of Jenks v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Jenks
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Anda, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Activas PLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Watson Pharma, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, GCP Pharma, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00380
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #50 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
August 30, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #50 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. ; (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; staying case; granting #55 Motion to Stay (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 59 Joint REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #55 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. ; (Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 8/29/2019 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
August 23, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #55 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) by City of Jenks ; (With attachments) (Court, Todd)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Response deadline to the Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings [Doc. 55] is due by August 26, 2019. A Reply, limited to 5 pages, is due by August 28, 2019., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 8/26/2019, Replies due by 8/28/2019) (Re: #55 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #51 MOTION to Expedite Ruling - Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Treatment of Motion to Remand ) by McKesson Corp. ; (Campbell, Stuart)
August 16, 2019 Filing 55 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
August 13, 2019 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC) by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Sharpe, G)
August 13, 2019 Filing 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.) by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Sharpe, G)
August 13, 2019 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Health Corporation (Sharpe, G)
August 9, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Expedite Ruling - Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Treatment of Motion to Remand (Re: #50 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by City of Jenks (With attachments) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by City of Jenks (With attachments) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Purdue Pharma L.P, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The) by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The (Coats, Sanford)
August 5, 2019 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma Inc. (Coats, Sanford)
August 5, 2019 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Purdue Pharma Inc., Other Affiliate Pharmaceutical Research Associates L.P. for Purdue Pharma L.P.) by Purdue Pharma L.P. (Coats, Sanford)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. [Note: Attorney G Calvin Sharpe added to party CVS Health Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney G Calvin Sharpe added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney G Calvin Sharpe added to party Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney G Calvin Sharpe added to party Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Sharpe, G)
August 2, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sanford C Coats on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. [Note: Attorney Sanford C Coats added to party Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Sanford C Coats added to party Purdue Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sanford C Coats added to party Purdue Pharma L.P.(pty:dft).] (Coats, Sanford)
July 30, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D)
July 26, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D)
July 26, 2019 Filing 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney D Todd Riddles added to party Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Riddles, D)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 25, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice - Other); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Notice of Removal - Amended) (Re: #35 Notice (Other) ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 Amended NOTICE of Removal by McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 7/24/2019 to change text to reflect correct event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
July 19, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: filers selected in error; Correction: removed filers selected in error (Re: #34 Appearance - Attorney,, ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2019 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Actavis LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Garner McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. [Note: Attorney Robert Garner McCampbell added to party Actavis LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Garner McCampbell added to party Actavis Pharma, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Garner McCampbell added to party Cephalon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Garner McCampbell added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Garner McCampbell added to party Watson Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft).] (McCampbell, Robert) Modified on 7/19/2019 to remove filers selected in error (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
July 18, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Merkley, Nicholas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholas Vernon Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. [Note: Attorney Nicholas Vernon Merkley added to party Actavis LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vernon Merkley added to party Actavis Pharma, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vernon Merkley added to party Cephalon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vernon Merkley added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vernon Merkley added to party Watson Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Merkley, Nicholas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Anne Price on behalf of Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney Elizabeth Anne Price added to party Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Price, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William A Johnson on behalf of Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Johnson, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. and McKesson Corp. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney Michael W Ridgeway added to party Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Ridgeway added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Ridgeway added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Ridgeway added to party Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Ridgeway, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Hunt Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney John Hunt Sparks added to party Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Hunt Sparks added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Hunt Sparks added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney John Hunt Sparks added to party Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Sparks, John)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or File Responsive Pleadings (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney William A Johnson added to party Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Johnson, William)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Granting Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 [Doc. 18]. Anda Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint within forty-five (45) days after the later of an entry of: 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action. ; granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart Douglas Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Allen Curran on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Allen Curran added to party Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Allen Curran added to party Anda, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Curran, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. [Note: Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Anda, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Quinn, Ashley)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc., Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court clerk randomly reassigning case due to attorney conflict, recusing Chief Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-CV-380-GKF-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., McKesson Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corp. and Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Edward Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2019-02431 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2077419) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (With attachments) (Zschiesche, Raymond)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
June 14, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by City of Jenks (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Jenks v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Raymond Edward Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Garner McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas Vernon Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activas PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Raymond Edward Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: William A Johnson
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Patricia Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Jenks
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Harrison Cole Lujan
Represented By: Matthew James Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?