Berger v. PennWell Corporation

Plaintiff: Noah Berger
Defendant: PennWell Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00391
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: James H Payne
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 ***Remark: per defense counsel, case has settled. Closing papers due within 10 days. The joint status report deadline is stricken (pll, Dpty Clk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/6/2019) (pll, Dpty Clk)
August 10, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PennWell Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Paul Limekiller on behalf of PennWell Corporation [Note: Attorney David Paul Limekiller added to party PennWell Corporation(pty:dft).] (Limekiller, David)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Todd Alan Nelson on behalf of PennWell Corporation (Nelson, Todd)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Clarion Events Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Clarion Events Ltd. for PennWell Corporation) by PennWell Corporation (Nelson, Todd)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: #1 Complaint ) by PennWell Corporation [Note: Attorney Todd Alan Nelson added to party PennWell Corporation(pty:dft).] (Nelson, Todd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to PennWell Corporation (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard Paul Liebowitz (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Noah Berger (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against PennWell Corporation (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2079560) by Noah Berger (With attachments) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. PennWell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennWell Corporation
Represented By: David Paul Limekiller
Represented By: Todd Alan Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Berger
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?