Bibby v. Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Bibby
Defendant: Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00392
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 2/28/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2020, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (srt, Dpty Clk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Amy Bibby (Vaught, Charles)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc. (Neal, Kathy)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/12/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
August 10, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Anna Christine Proctor on behalf of Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc. [Note: Attorney Anna Christine Proctor added to party Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Proctor, Anna)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc. (Neal, Kathy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kathy Rene Neal on behalf of Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc. [Note: Attorney Kathy Rene Neal added to party Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Neal, Kathy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc. (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2079847) by Amy Bibby (Vaught, Charles)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Amy Bibby (Vaught, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bibby v. Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Bibby
Represented By: Jessica Nicole Vaught
Represented By: Charles Christopher Vaught
Represented By: Charles C Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Action Project of Tulsa County, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Christine Proctor
Represented By: Kathy Rene Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?