Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. v. Treehouse Dispensary LLC
Plaintiff: Nelvana Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Treehouse Dispensary LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00398
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Order for Joint Status Report (Doc. 14) is hereby stricken. Additionally, the deadline to file the Joint Status Report is also stricken., striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s), striking/withdrawing document(s) (Re: #14 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (Documents Terminated: #14 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; terminating #16 Motion for Leave to Appear; granting #16 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Treehouse Dispensary LLC by Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (With attachments) (Bowman, Jessica)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , adding attorney Jessica Cohen-Nowak,Jonathan D Reichman for Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. terminating attorney Jessica Cohen-Nowak and Jonathan D Reichman, striking/withdrawing document(s) (Re: #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan Reichman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2094820), #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica Cohen-Nowak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2094804), #11 Order, Adding/Terminating Attorney(s), Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ) (Documents Terminated: #11 Order, Adding/Terminating Attorney(s), Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ) (lmc, Chambers)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/17/2019) (lmc, Chambers) Modified on 9/9/2019 - STRICKEN per 18 (sac, Dpty Clk).
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan D Reichman on behalf of Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (Reichman, Jonathan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Cohen-Nowak on behalf of Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (Cohen-Nowak, Jessica)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; adding attorney Jessica Cohen-Nowak,Jonathan D Reichman for Treehouse Dispensary LLC ; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers) Modified on 8/20/2019 - STRICKEN per #15 (sac, Dpty Clk).
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan Reichman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2094820) by Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica Cohen-Nowak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2094804) by Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Corus Entertainment, Inc., Corporate Parent 1421711 Ontario Inc. for Nelvana Enterprises, Inc.) by Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Treehouse Dispensary LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Jonathan D Reichman and Jessica Cohen-Nowak to file by 8/14/2019 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Treehouse Dispensary LLC (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Treehouse Dispensary LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2081476) by Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica) Modified on 7/19/2019 to add receipt number (sc, Dpty Clk).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelvana Enterprises, Inc. v. Treehouse Dispensary LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelvana Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Cohen-Nowak
Represented By: Jessica Lynn John Bowman
Represented By: Jonathan D Reichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treehouse Dispensary LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?