Sneed v. Walton et al
Plaintiff: Jimmie Otto Sneed, II
Defendant: Scott Walton and Dereck Davis
Case Number: 4:2019cv00399
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/18/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of Scott Walton [Note: Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party Scott Walton(pty:dft).] (LeBlanc, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Scott Walton (McDonald, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan Alan McDonald on behalf of Scott Walton [Note: Attorney Ryan Alan McDonald added to party Scott Walton(pty:dft).] (McDonald, Ryan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Scott Walton (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jimmie Otto Sneed, II (Smolen, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2081525) by Jimmie Otto Sneed, II (Smolen, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jimmie Otto Sneed, II (Smolen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sneed v. Walton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Otto Sneed, II
Represented By: Bryon Davis Helm
Represented By: Robert Murray Blakemore
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walton
Represented By: Ryan Alan McDonald
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dereck Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?