Davis v. PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC
Plaintiff: Angelica Davis
Defendant: PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00404
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case as there is a pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8) and a pending Motion to Remand (Doc. 12) which should first be resolved. (Re: #24 Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand ) by Angelica Davis ; (Camp, Christopher)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT STATUS REPORT by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (Pearson, Emily)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Plaintiff Angelica Davis may file her Reply supporting her Motion to Remand no later than September 12, 2019. Plaintiff's Unopposed Application for Enlargement of Deadline to File Reply Brief (Doc. 22) is denied as moot. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Replies due by 9/12/2019); finding as moot #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand ) by Angelica Davis (Camp, Christopher)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Quash Summons of Defendant/Motion to Dismiss, #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC ; (Pearson, Emily)
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand ) by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC ; (With attachments) (Pearson, Emily)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 Amended RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Quash (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Quash Summons of Defendant/Motion to Dismiss ) by Angelica Davis ; (With attachments) (Camp, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - The Unopposed Application to File Amended Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Quash Summons to Conform with LCvR7.2(c) (Doc. 17) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's amended response is due on or before 8/23/2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 8/23/2019); granting #17 Motion to Amend (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Quash Summons of Defendant/Motion to Dismiss, #16 Response in Opposition to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Dkt #16 to Conform with LCvR7.2(c) by Angelica Davis (Camp, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Quash Summons of Defendant/Motion to Dismiss ) by Angelica Davis ; (With attachments) (Camp, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/9/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - R. Jay McAtee's Motion to Withdraw as counsel for Defendant is denied as moot, as Mr. McAtee was terminated as counsel for Defendant on July 25, 2019, pursuant to the Status Report on Removed Action (Doc. 7). ; granting #13 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) R. Jay McAtee by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (Pearson, Emily)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Angelica Davis (With attachments) (Camp, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 ***Motion Referral(s) terminated (Re: #9 MOTION to Quash Summons of Defendant/Motion to Dismiss ) (a-srt, Dpty Clk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #9 MOTION to Quash Summons of Defendant/Motion to Dismiss, #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (With attachments) (Pearson, Emily)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (Pearson, Emily)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash Summons of Defendant/Motion to Dismiss by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (With attachments) (Pearson, Emily)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (With attachments) (Pearson, Emily) Modified on 7/30/2019 this is a two-part motion that was filed as one part - see #9 for Motion to Quash (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (Pearson, Emily)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph R Farris on behalf of PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (Farris, Joseph)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emily D Pearson on behalf of PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (Pearson, Emily)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-2399 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2082067) by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (With attachments) (Pearson, Emily)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (Pearson, Emily)
June 13, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC by Angelica Davis (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Davis
Represented By: Christopher Lincoln Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R Farris
Represented By: Robert Jay McAtee
Represented By: Emily D Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?