Glass v. Southlake Dialysis, LLC
Plaintiff: Joshua Glass
Defendant: Davita Inc. and Southlake Dialysis, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00413
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Renal Treatment Centers-West, Inc., Corporate Parent Broken Arrow Investment Venture, LLC for Southlake Dialysis, LLC) by Southlake Dialysis, LLC (Martin, Timothy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Southlake Dialysis, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/3/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: #5 Amended Complaint ) by Southlake Dialysis, LLC [Note: Attorney Timothy Lee Martin added to party Southlake Dialysis, LLC(pty:dft).] (Martin, Timothy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Southlake Dialysis, LLC (Re: #5 Amended Complaint ) by Joshua Glass (Edwards, Mark)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Southlake Dialysis, LLC (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Davita Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint ) by Joshua Glass (Edwards, Mark)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Davita Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Joshua Glass (Edwards, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Davita Inc. (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Davita Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2086282) by Joshua Glass (Edwards, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Joshua Glass (Edwards, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. Southlake Dialysis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Glass
Represented By: Mark Lynn markmarEdwards
Represented By: Mark Lynn Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davita Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southlake Dialysis, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?