United States of America v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tarah F Jones and Ryan K Jones
Case Number: 4:2019cv00432
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/4/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ryan K Jones, Tarah F Jones (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tarah F Jones (Re: #2 Complaint ) by United States of America (Lee, Julian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ryan K Jones (Re: #2 Complaint ) by United States of America (Lee, Julian)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ryan K Jones, Tarah F Jones (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ryan K Jones, Tarah F Jones by United States of America (Lee, Julian)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Lee, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarah F Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julian Todd Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?