United States of America v. Unknown Heirs of M.C. Spencer, The et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert L Spencer, Board of County Commissioners, Tulsa County, County Treasurer, Tulsa County, Unknown Heirs of Betty R. Spencer, The and Unknown Heirs of M.C. Spencer, The
Case Number: 4:2019cv00444
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Certificate of Service); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Summons Returned Executed) (Re: #13 Certificate of Service, #14 Certificate of Service, #12 Certificate of Service ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed upon Tulsa County Treasurer by United States of America (Gallant, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/10/2019 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed upon Board of County Commissioners, Tulsa County by United States of America (Gallant, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/10/2019 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed upon Robert Spencer by United States of America (Gallant, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/10/2019 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Board of County Commissioners, Tulsa County (Wilson, Douglas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Allen Wilson on behalf of Board of County Commissioners, Tulsa County [Note: Attorney Douglas Allen Wilson added to party Board of County Commissioners, Tulsa County(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Douglas)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell substituting Jeffrey A. Gallant and ; terminating attorney Loretta Finiece Radford ; granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.)(kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by United States of America [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Andrew Gallant added to party United States of America(pty:pla).] (Gallant, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #6 Motion for Service by Publication (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service by Publication by United States of America (Radford, Loretta)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by County Treasurer, Tulsa County (Wilson, Douglas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas Allen Wilson on behalf of County Treasurer, Tulsa County [Note: Attorney Douglas Allen Wilson added to party County Treasurer, Tulsa County(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Douglas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Board of County Commissioners, Tulsa County, County Treasurer, Tulsa County, Robert L Spencer (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America (With attachments) (Radford, Loretta)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Radford, Loretta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Unknown Heirs of M.C. Spencer, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners, Tulsa County
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Treasurer, Tulsa County
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Betty R. Spencer, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of M.C. Spencer, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Loretta Finiece Radford
Represented By: Jeffrey Andrew Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?