Patel et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Shailesh Patel and Hina Patel
Petitioner: Savitaben Patel and Ishverbhai Patel
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00447
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 12/17/2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/17/2019); granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lmc, Chambers)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #4 Amended Complaint ) by United States of America [Note: Attorney Gretchen Ellen Nygaard added to party United States of America(pty:res).] (Nygaard, Gretchen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sloane Ryan Lile on behalf of Hina Patel, Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel, Shailesh Patel (Lile, Sloane)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Savitaben Patel, Ishverbhai Patel (With attachments) (Shank, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Addison Shank on behalf of Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Shank, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2093307) by Savitaben Patel, Ishverbhai Patel (With attachments) (Shank, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Shank, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Ellen Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Savitaben Patel
Represented By: Sloane Ryan Lile
Represented By: Andrew Addison Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ishverbhai Patel
Represented By: Sloane Ryan Lile
Represented By: Andrew Addison Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shailesh Patel
Represented By: Sloane Ryan Lile
Represented By: Andrew Addison Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hina Patel
Represented By: Sloane Ryan Lile
Represented By: Andrew Addison Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?