Mooney et al v. Regalado et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Lawson, Terran Morrow, Earl Mooney and Terran Marrow
Defendant: Vic Regalado, Rickardo Orlando Williams and Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County
Case Number: 4:2019cv00462
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by Vic Regalado ; (Wilkes, Keith)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case as there are pending Motions to Dismiss (Doc. 6, 7) which should first be resolved. (Re: #14 Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Matthew Lawson, Terran Marrow, Earl Mooney (Smolen, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by Earl Mooney ; (Smolen, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by Earl Mooney ; (Smolen, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to a conflict, recusing Chief Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-CV-462-TCK-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Walker O'Connor on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County, Vic Regalado [Note: Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County(pty:dft), Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party Vic Regalado(pty:dft).] (O'Connor, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Rickardo Orlando Williams Served with Petition and Alias Summons on August 23, 2019 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Earl Mooney, Matthew Lawson, Terran Marrow (Smolen, Daniel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Vic Regalado (Wilkes, Keith)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County (Wilkes, Keith)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/26/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Keith A Wilkes on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County, Vic Regalado (Wilkes, Keith)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County, Vic Regalado (Wilkes, Keith)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2018-4813 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-209936) by Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County (With attachments) (Wilkes, Keith) Modified on 8/22/2019 to add receipt number (sc, Dpty Clk).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County, Vic Regalado (Wilkes, Keith)
November 26, 2018 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Earl Mooney, Matthew Lawson, Terran Morrow (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooney et al v. Regalado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lawson
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terran Morrow
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Mooney
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terran Marrow
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Regalado
Represented By: Keith A Wilkes
Represented By: William Walker O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickardo Orlando Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County
Represented By: Keith A Wilkes
Represented By: William Walker O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?