Johnson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Teresa Michelle Johnson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00465
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Third MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Teresa Michelle Johnson (White, Timothy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Re: #7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Teresa Michelle Johnson (White, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/27/2019) (Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning this case upon the filing of Dkt #4 and pursuant to General Order 16-08. Reassigning case to Chief Judge John E. Dowdell and Magistrate Judge Frank H. McCarthy, changing case number to 19-cv-465-JED-FHM (Re: #4 Statement Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Social Security) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
August 23, 2019 ***Remark: 2 summons in hold tray (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Teresa Michelle Johnson (White, Timothy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Teresa Michelle Johnson (White, Timothy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Teresa Michelle Johnson (With attachments) (White, Timothy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Teresa Michelle Johnson (White, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Timothy Morris White
Represented By: Richmond Jay Brownson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?