Nichols et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Boris Bernard Nichols and Tonnie Chicke Nichols
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 4:2019cv00482
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk re: remand (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #7 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The plaintiffs' attempt to remove this action for the third time is improper, and the action is remanded to Tulsa County District Court, Case No. CJ-2017-1957. Plaintiff has not established a basis for her request for injunctive relief, and her requests for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction are denied. As the Court has now ruled, the plaintiff's motion to expedite is moot ; remanding case (terminates case) ; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot #6 Motion to Expedite Ruling (JED1, Chambers)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Ruling (Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis , #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (sc, Dpty Clk). Modified on 9/9/2019 to attach file stamped PDF (sc, Dpty Clk).
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT(S) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2017-1957 by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2017 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against U.S. Bank National Association by Tonnie Chicke Nichols, Boris Bernard Nichols (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Bernard Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonnie Chicke Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Donald J Timberlake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?