Pawnee Nation of Oklahoma v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Pawnee Nation of Oklahoma
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Morris & Dickson Co, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Wal-Mart Inc., Actavis PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corp., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Walgreen Co., SAJ Distributors, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Morris & Dickson Co, LLC. and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00556
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 ***Remark: Case transferred from Oklahoma Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-46017, filed 11/15/2019. (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 12, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #27 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by John W Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, transferring case (terminates case) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred (jjs, Dpty Clk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 25 ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (jjs, Dpty Clk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson; Corporate Parent Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Hunt Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (pll, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. [Note: Attorney D Michael McBride, III added to party Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp.(pty:dft).] (McBride, D)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp.) by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. [Note: Attorney Susan E Huntsman added to party Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp.(pty:dft).] (Huntsman, Susan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Notice of Federal Preliminary Injunction Order by Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (With attachments) (Burns, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for Purdue Frederick Company, The) by Purdue Frederick Company, The (Burns, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma Inc. (Burns, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma L.P. (Burns, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Hans Way on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Way, Evan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joshua D Burns on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Burns, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., McKesson Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corp., Purdue Pharma Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart Douglas Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Pawnee County, case number CJ-19-63 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2124020) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by McKesson Corp. [Note: Attorney Stuart Douglas Campbell added to party McKesson Corp.(pty:dft).] (Campbell, Stuart)
July 30, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Pawnee Nation of Oklahoma (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pawnee Nation of Oklahoma v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Evan Hans Way
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Evan Hans Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Evan Hans Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corp.
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Evan Hans Way
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Campbell
Represented By: Kaylee Patricia Davis-Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Evan Hans Way
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Evan Hans Way
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: John Hunt Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Evan Hans Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp.
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pawnee Nation of Oklahoma
Represented By: Harrison Cole Lujan
Represented By: Scott Emory Poynter
Represented By: Matthew James Sill
Represented By: Curtis Muskrat Bruehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?