Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. v. Everest National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Everest National Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00571
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong "against" party selected; Correction: changed "against" party (Re: #18 Third Party Complaint ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jibril Greene (Doc. 20) is granted. Mr. Greene may appear in this matter on behalf of the defendant. ; granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Keeley (Doc. 19) is granted. Mr. Keeley may appear in this matter on behalf of the defendant. ; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jibril Greene to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2148676) by Everest National Insurance Company (With attachments) (Crapster, Gary)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Keeley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2148670) by Everest National Insurance Company (With attachments) (Crapster, Gary)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. by Everest National Insurance Company (Crapster, Gary) Modified on 12/12/2019 to correct "against" party (sac, Dpty Clk).
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 COUNTERCLAIM against Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. by Everest National Insurance Company (Crapster, Gary)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: 5 Complaint ) by Everest National Insurance Company (Crapster, Gary)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/9/2020) (SAS, Chambers)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Everest Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Everest Reinsurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Everest Underwriting Group (Ireland) Limited, Corporate Parent Everest Re Group, Ltd., a publicly traded company for Everest National Insurance Company) by Everest National Insurance Company (Crapster, Gary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Everest National Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. 11) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed by December 12, 2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/12/2019); granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: 5 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: 5 Complaint ) by Everest National Insurance Company (Crapster, Gary)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gary Clark Crapster on behalf of Everest National Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Gary Clark Crapster added to party Everest National Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Crapster, Gary)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Everest National Insurance Company (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. (Lewin, Randall)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Ellis Esmond on behalf of Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. (Esmond, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Everest National Insurance Company (redocketed because wrong event selected on document number 2) by Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick Dennis O'Connor on behalf of Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. (O'Connor, Patrick)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall Jay Lewin on behalf of Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. (Lewin, Randall)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Everest National Insurance Company (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2127216) by Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. (Lewin, Randall) Modified on 10/28/2019 - ENTERED IN ERROR - wrong event selected - see 5 for correct entry (sac, Dpty Clk).
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. (Lewin, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc. v. Everest National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Clark Crapster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mabrey Bancorporation, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ellis Esmond
Represented By: Randall Jay Lewin
Represented By: Patrick Dennis O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?