Barre v. Broadspire Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Etta Barre
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Broadspire Services, Inc. and Crawford & Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00604
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case as there is a pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15) which should first be resolved. (Re: #19 Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Etta Barre (Smolen, Daniel)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support ) by Etta Barre ; (Smolen, Daniel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Broadspire Services, Inc. (Henry, Andrew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Federal Insurance Company (Henry, Andrew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Crawford & Company (Henry, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company) by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company (Morgan, Mack)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Chubb National Insurance Company) by Chubb National Insurance Company (Morgan, Mack)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Federal Insurance Company) by Federal Insurance Company (Morgan, Mack)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Crawford & Company for Broadspire Services, Inc.) by Broadspire Services, Inc. (Morgan, Mack)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crawford & Company (Morgan, Mack)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mack Jay Morgan, III on behalf of All Defendants (Morgan, Mack)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Broadspire Services, Inc., Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Crawford & Company, Federal Insurance Company (Henry, Andrew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew E Henry on behalf of All Defendants (Henry, Andrew)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/9/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Broadspire Services, Inc; Crawford & Company, Federal Insurance Company; Chubb National Insurance Company; Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Broadspire Services, Inc., Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Crawford & Company, Federal Insurance Company (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, case number CJ-19-3855 by Broadspire Services, Inc., Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Crawford & Company, Federal Insurance Company (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Crawford & Crawford, Broadspire Services, Inc. (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 11/8/2019 to add Filers (dlg, Dpty Clk).
October 1, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Etta Barre (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barre v. Broadspire Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Mack Jay Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Mack Jay Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Mack Jay Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadspire Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Mack Jay Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford & Company
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Mack Jay Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Barre
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?