Vincenty v. AMCOL Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Vincenty
Defendant: AMCOL Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00621
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 5/8/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 5/22/2020, Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 9/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Michael Vincenty (Wandres, Victor)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elliot Paul Anderson on behalf of AMCOL Systems, Inc. [Note: Attorney Elliot Paul Anderson added to party AMCOL Systems, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Anderson, Elliot)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: AMCOL Systems, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Michael Vincenty (With attachments) (Wandres, Victor)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing AMCOL Systems, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/6/2020) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMCOL Systems, Inc. (Huntsman, Susan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by AMCOL Systems, Inc. (Huntsman, Susan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of AMCOL Systems, Inc. [Note: Attorney Susan E Huntsman added to party AMCOL Systems, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Huntsman, Susan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to AMCOL Systems, Inc. (alg, Dpty Clk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AMCOL Systems, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2136901) by Michael Vincenty (Wandres, Victor)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael Vincenty (Wandres, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincenty v. AMCOL Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vincenty
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCOL Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: Elliot Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?