State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Sweet Appetit, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Sweet Appetit, Inc., Ludger Schulz and SGN Foods, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00630
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ludger Schulz (Re: #5 Amended Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Brittingham, Galen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to SGN Foods, LLC (alg, Dpty Clk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (alg, Dpty Clk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (With attachments) (Brittingham, Galen)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Brittingham, Galen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2138910) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (With attachments) (Brittingham, Galen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Brittingham, Galen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Sweet Appetit, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Galen Lee Brittingham
Represented By: James Newton Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Appetit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ludger Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGN Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?