Ferguson et al v. Pottery Barn, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Ferguson and James Ferguson
Defendant: Pottery Barn, Inc. and Williams-Sonoma, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00633
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance of Elizabeth Myers on behalf of Pottery Barn, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. [Note: Attorney Elizabeth Myers added to party Pottery Barn, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Myers added to party Williams-Sonoma, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Myers, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/17/2020 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
January 17, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice - Other); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Appearance - Attorney) (Re: #16 Notice (Other), ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sydne K. Collier on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Sydne K. Collier added to party Pottery Barn, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sydne K. Collier added to party Williams-Sonoma, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Collier, Sydne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicole Williams on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Nicole Williams added to party Pottery Barn, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Williams added to party Williams-Sonoma, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Williams, Nicole)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Williams-Sonoma, Inc. for Pottery Barn, Inc.) by Pottery Barn, Inc. (Caldwell, Andre')
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (Caldwell, Andre')
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicole Williams (Doc. 8), Elizabeth G. Myers (Doc. 9) and Sydne K. Collier (Doc. 10) are granted. Counsel may appear in this matter on behalf of the defendants. ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sydne K. Collier to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2157518) by Pottery Barn, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (With attachments) (Caldwell, Andre')
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth Myers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2157512) by Pottery Barn, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (With attachments) (Caldwell, Andre')
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicole Williams to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2157509) by Pottery Barn, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (With attachments) (Caldwell, Andre')
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Pottery Barn, Inc. and Williams-Sonoma, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to Williams-Sonoma, Inc., Pottery Barn, Inc. Returned Executed (Re: #4 Amended Complaint ) by Williams-Sonoma, Inc., Pottery Barn, Inc. [Note: Attorney Andre' Brandon Caldwell added to party Pottery Barn, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andre' Brandon Caldwell added to party Williams-Sonoma, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Caldwell, Andre')
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andre' Brandon Caldwell on behalf of Pottery Barn, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. (Caldwell, Andre')
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by James Ferguson, Patrick Ferguson (Smolen, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (alg, Dpty Clk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2139529) by James Ferguson, Patrick Ferguson (Smolen, Daniel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by James Ferguson, Patrick Ferguson [Note: Attorney Daniel E Smolen added to party James Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel E Smolen added to party Patrick Ferguson(pty:pla).] (Smolen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson et al v. Pottery Barn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ferguson
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ferguson
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottery Barn, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Myers
Represented By: Sydne K. Collier
Represented By: Nicole Williams
Represented By: Andre' Brandon Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Myers
Represented By: Sydne K. Collier
Represented By: Nicole Williams
Represented By: Andre' Brandon Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?