Stevens v. Berryhill Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Angela Stevens
Defendant: Brian Hailey, Berryhill Public Schools, James Fox, Zach Arterberry, Berryhill Board of Education, Megan Ennis, Ronna Taylor and Levi Bradley
Case Number: 4:2019cv00637
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ronna Taylor (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Angela Stevens (Dunn, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Berryhill Public Schools (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Angela Stevens (Dunn, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Berryhill Board of Education (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Angela Stevens (Dunn, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James Fox, Brian Hailey, Ronna Taylor (Cyran, Matthew)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Berryhill Public Schools (Cyran, Matthew)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Berryhill Public Schools, James Fox, Brian Hailey, Ronna Taylor (Cyran, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jerry Alan Richardson on behalf of Ronna Taylor [Note: Attorney Jerry Alan Richardson added to party Ronna Taylor(pty:dft).] (Richardson, Jerry)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Peter Cyran on behalf of Ronna Taylor (Cyran, Matthew)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The unopposed motion for extension of time to answer (Doc. 8) is granted. The answer of defendant Ronna Taylor is due January 14, 2020 ; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JED1, Chambers)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ronna Taylor [Note: Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party Ronna Taylor(pty:dft).] (Cyran, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Unopposed Motion of Defendants Berryhill Public Schools, James Fox, and Brian Hailey for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Doc. 5) is granted. Defendants' answers or other responsive pleadings shall be filed by January 14, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/14/2020); granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Peter Cyran on behalf of Berryhill Public Schools, James Fox, Brian Hailey [Note: Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party Berryhill Public Schools(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party James Fox (pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Peter Cyran added to party Brian Hailey (pty:dft).] (Cyran, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Berryhill Public Schools, James Fox, Brian Hailey (Richardson, Jerry)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jerry Alan Richardson on behalf of Berryhill Public Schools, James Fox, Brian Hailey [Note: Attorney Jerry Alan Richardson added to party Berryhill Public Schools(pty:dft), Attorney Jerry Alan Richardson added to party James Fox (pty:dft), Attorney Jerry Alan Richardson added to party Brian Hailey (pty:dft).] (Richardson, Jerry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (alg, Dpty Clk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2140797) by Angela Stevens (Dunn, John)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Angela Stevens (Dunn, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Berryhill Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hailey
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Jerry Alan Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berryhill Public Schools
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Jerry Alan Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fox
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Jerry Alan Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Arterberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berryhill Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronna Taylor
Represented By: Matthew Peter Cyran
Represented By: Jerry Alan Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Stevens
Represented By: John Mikel Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?