Krajian v. Cothran et al
Plaintiff: Mallory A Krajian
Defendant: Chane Cothran, Amy McCartney and Eric Bentz
Case Number: 4:2019cv00685
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Eric Bentz, Chane Cothran ; (Sisemore, Alexander)
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss of Amy McCartney (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Mallory A Krajian ; (McHugh, Brendan)
January 20, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss of Chane Cothran and Eric Bentz (Re: #8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Mallory A Krajian ; (McHugh, Brendan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Amy McCartney [Note: Attorney John K.F. Langford added to party Amy McCartney(pty:dft).] (Langford, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by Chane Cothran (Sisemore, Alexander)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by Eric Bentz (Sisemore, Alexander)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Eric Bentz, Chane Cothran (Sisemore, Alexander)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Amy McCartney (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Mallory A Krajian (McHugh, Brendan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by Mallory A Krajian (McHugh, Brendan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brendan Michael McHugh on behalf of Mallory A Krajian (McHugh, Brendan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Eric Bentz, Chane Cothran (Sisemore, Alexander)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2019-4291 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2149841) by Eric Bentz, Chane Cothran (With attachments) (Sisemore, Alexander)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Eric Bentz, Chane Cothran (Sisemore, Alexander)
October 31, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Mallory A Krajian (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krajian v. Cothran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chane Cothran
Represented By: John Jay Bowling
Represented By: Alexander Jeffress Sisemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy McCartney
Represented By: John K.F. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Bentz
Represented By: John Jay Bowling
Represented By: Alexander Jeffress Sisemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallory A Krajian
Represented By: Brendan Michael McHugh
Represented By: Dana Grey Jim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?