Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Office on Main LLC, The et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Combine Music Corp., Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music, Ben Peters Music, Hifrost Publishing, Cotillion Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc. and Get Loose Music, Inc.
Defendant: Office on Main LLC, The, Sherri Barrett and Office
Case Number: 4:2019cv00692
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiffs have filed an agreed motion to extend deadline for defendants answer (Dkt. # 22). Plaintiff's represent that they and defendants are attempting to resolve this issue, that defendants have not yet obtained counsel, and that defendants have no objection to and join in this motion. Therefore, the motion (Dkt. #22) is granted. Defendants are directed to file their answer or other responsive pleading no later than 2/12/2020 as requested. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to send a copy of this minute order to defendants, and to file a certificate of service of same, due forthwith. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/12/2020); granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Cotillion Music, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sherri Barrett (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Songs of Universal, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Combine Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music, Velvet Apple Music, Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc. (With attachments) (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Office on Main LLC, The (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Songs of Universal, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Combine Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music, Velvet Apple Music, Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc. (With attachments) (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Cotillion Music, Inc.) by Cotillion Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc.) by Songs of Universal, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent EMI Blackwood Music Inc. for Combine Music Corp.) by Combine Music Corp. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Velvet Apple Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hifrost Publishing (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Get Loose Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ben Peters Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Terry Stafford Music Co. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hip City Music Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bocephus Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sherri Barrett, Office on Main LLC, The (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tiffany Nichole Browning on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Browning, Tiffany)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Cotillion Music, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rose Sharrock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2152587) by Songs of Universal, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Combine Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Welsh Witch Music, Velvet Apple Music, Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ben Peters Music, Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Cotillion Music, Inc., Get Loose Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Terry Stafford Music Co., Velvet Apple Music, Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Office on Main LLC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office on Main LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hip City Music Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Stafford Music Co.
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp.
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velvet Apple Music
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Peters Music
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hifrost Publishing
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Get Loose Music, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Nichole Browning
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?