Coppege et al v. Cabot Norit Americas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Judy Coppedge and Craig Coppedge
Defendant: Cabot Corporation, Brown and Root Industrial Services, LLC, K J Hathi, Dravo Corporation, Buffalo Tank Corporation, Maintenance Enterprises, LLC, Carmeuse, Maintenance Enterprises, Inc., Ralph Ratliff, Bethlehem Steel Corporation, Williams Construction Company, Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC, Ratliff, Inc., Brent Electric Co., Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc., L&M Fabrication, Inc. and Carmeuse Lime, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00705
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering the scheduling order. If necessary, a scheduling order will be entered after ruling on the pending motion to remand (Dkt. # 37). (Re: #66 Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1, #37 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support, State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
February 10, 2020 Filing 66 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Craig Coppedge, Judy Coppedge (Frasier, James)
February 7, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Re: #37 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by Cabot Corporation, Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Lennon, John)
January 30, 2020 Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Brent Electric Co. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent KBR, Inc., Corporate Parent KBR Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Brown & Root IS Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Bernhard Capital Partners, LP for Brown and Root Industrial Services, LLC) by Brown and Root Industrial Services, LLC (Woodward, Rebecca)
January 29, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion to File Document Out of Time - see 62 (Re: #59 MOTION to Clarify ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Brown and Root Industrial Services, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 28, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to File Answer Out of Time alternatively (submitted as part of #59 ) by Brent Electric Co. (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The Court is in receipt of defendant Brent Electric Co.'s answer as filed at Dkt. #33-9. No further action regarding answer on behalf of Brent Electric Co. is necessary at this time. Counsel is advised that the parties' Joint Status Report remains due 2/10/2020 (see Dkt. # 19, 43). ; granting #59 Motion to Clarify (Re: #33 Notice (Other), #59 MOTION to Clarify Or in the Alternative Leave to Amend, State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 28, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Clarify by Brent Electric Co. (Moen, Eric) Modified on 1/29/2020; this is a two-part motion of which one part was efiled - see 62 for Motion to File Answer Out of Time (sac, Dpty Clk).
January 28, 2020 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brent Electric Co. (Moen, Eric)
January 28, 2020 Filing 57 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric Anders Moen on behalf of Brent Electric Co. (Moen, Eric)
January 28, 2020 Filing 56 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bart Jay Robey on behalf of Brent Electric Co. (Robey, Bart)
January 27, 2020 Filing 55 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Brown and Root Industrial Services, LLC (Woodward, Rebecca)
January 24, 2020 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by L&M Fabrication, Inc. (Dittrich, Melanie)
January 24, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by L&M Fabrication, Inc. (Dittrich, Melanie)
January 24, 2020 Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing L&M Fabrication, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; terminating attorney Frederick Herman Sordahl, Jr ; granting #50 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 23, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Fred H. Sordahl by L&M Fabrication, Inc. (Dittrich, Melanie)
January 23, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by L&M Fabrication, Inc. (Dittrich, Melanie)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - CORRECTING/ADDING deadline: Defendant L&M Fabrications, Inc may file their answer or other responsive pleading no later than 2/4/2020., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/4/2020) (Re: 47 Minute Order,,, Ruling on Motion for Leave to File Document(s),, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the unopposed motion #46 is granted. Defendant, L&M Fabrications, Inc. may file their answer out of time as requested. Said answer or other responsive pleading is due forthwith. Defendant is also directed to file a Separate Notice of Party Name Correction stating whether the true and accurate name of the company is L&M Fabrication, Inc. or L&M Fabrications, Inc. ; granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 22, 2020 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by L&M Fabrication, Inc. (Dittrich, Melanie)
January 22, 2020 Filing 45 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Derrick Thad DeWitt on behalf of L&M Fabrication, Inc. [Note: Attorney Derrick Thad DeWitt added to party L&M Fabrication, Inc.(pty:dft).] (DeWitt, Derrick)
January 22, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Melanie Kay Dittrich on behalf of L&M Fabrication, Inc. [Note: Attorney Melanie Kay Dittrich added to party L&M Fabrication, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Dittrich, Melanie)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Advising all counsel of the 2/10/2020 deadline for filing of the parties' joint status report as set forth in Dkt. # 19. (Re: #19 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - that the unopposed motion #39 is granted. Plaintiffs' response to the motion to dismiss #9 shall be due no later that 14 days after the Court's ruling on the motion to remand #37 . ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #37 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 21, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: duplicative entry of #37; Correction: marked entry as Entered in Error (Re: #38 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 17, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE Consent to Removal (Re: #1 Notice of Removal ) by Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC (Betts, Robert)
January 17, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE Notice of Consent and Consent to Removal of Ratliff, Inc. and Ralph Ratliff (Re: #1 Notice of Removal ) by Ralph Ratliff, Ratliff, Inc. (Tracy, Ronald)
January 17, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Craig Coppedge, Judy Coppedge (Frasier, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Craig Coppedge, Judy Coppedge (With attachments) (Frasier, James) Modified on 1/21/2020 - ENTERED IN ERROR - duplicative of #37 (sac, Dpty Clk).
January 17, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Craig Coppedge, Judy Coppedge (With attachments) (Frasier, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frank W Frasier, III on behalf of Craig Coppedge, Judy Coppedge (Frasier, Frank)
January 17, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Edward Frasier on behalf of Craig Coppedge, Judy Coppedge (Frasier, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Carmeuse America Holding, Corporate Parent Carmeuse North America BV for Carmeuse Lime, Inc.) by Carmeuse Lime, Inc. (Woodard, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE Notice of Filing of Additional Documents in State Court Case by Cabot Corporation, Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc. (With attachments) (Lennon, John)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The Court has been advised that pleadings were filed in the state court matter during the process of removal which were not included in removing defendants' copy of the state court record which was filed as part of its notice of removal. Removing defendants are directed to file forthwith a complete updated copy of the state court record and docket sheet. (Re: #1 Notice of Removal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 14, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Carmeuse Lime, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (jjs, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/14/2020 (jjs, Dpty Clk).
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Carmeuse be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #29 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Carmeuse (Woodard, John)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing defendant named in the complaint as "Carmeuse" to file forthwith a separate Notice of Party Name Correction as indicated in its Answer filed at #26 . (Re: #26 Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 10, 2020 Filing 27 Supplemental CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Crown Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent MEI Group, LLC for Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC) by Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC (Betts, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Carmeuse (Woodard, John)
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholaus Adam Hancock on behalf of Carmeuse [Note: Attorney Nicholaus Adam Hancock added to party Carmeuse(pty:dft).] (Hancock, Nicholaus)
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Bruce Morsman on behalf of Carmeuse [Note: Attorney Andrew Bruce Morsman added to party Carmeuse(pty:dft).] (Morsman, Andrew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John R Woodard, III on behalf of Carmeuse (Woodard, John)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ratliff, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 9, 2020 Filing 21 Supplemental CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent NEI Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Crown Enterprises, LLC for Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC) by Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC (Betts, Robert)
January 9, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent NEI Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Crown Enterprises, LLC for Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC) by Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC (Betts, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 2/10/2020) (RGG, Chambers)
January 8, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Ralph Ratliff, Ratliff, Inc. (Tracy, Ronald)
January 8, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Ratliff, Inc. for Ratliff, Inc.) by Ratliff, Inc. (Tracy, Ronald)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ronald R Tracy on behalf of Ralph Ratliff, Ratliff, Inc. [Note: Attorney Ronald R Tracy added to party Ralph Ratliff(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald R Tracy added to party Ratliff, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Tracy, Ronald)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Williams Construction Company and Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Williams Construction Company (Rains, Mark)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Stanley Rains on behalf of Williams Construction Company [Note: Attorney Mark Stanley Rains added to party Williams Construction Company(pty:dft).] (Rains, Mark)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gerald Patrick Green on behalf of Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC [Note: Attorney Gerald Patrick Green added to party Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft).] (Green, Gerald)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Lamar Betts on behalf of Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC (Betts, Robert)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC [Note: Attorney Robert Lamar Betts added to party Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft).] (Betts, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cabot Corporation, Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc. (Lennon, John)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Cabot Corporation, Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc. (Lennon, John)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cabot Corporation (Lennon, John)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cabot Corporation for Cabot Norit Americas, Inc.) by Cabot Norit Americas, Inc. (Lennon, John)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel J Hoehner on behalf of Cabot Corporation, Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc. (Hoehner, Daniel)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Cabot Corporation, Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John C Lennon on behalf of Cabot Corporation, Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc. (Lennon, John)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County, case number CJ-19-107 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2153316) by Cabot Corporation, Cabot Norit Americas, Inc., Norit Americas, Inc. (With attachments) (Lennon, John)
June 4, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Craig Coppedge, Judy Coppedge (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coppege et al v. Cabot Norit Americas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Corporation
Represented By: John C Lennon
Represented By: Daniel J Hoehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown and Root Industrial Services, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca S Woodward
Represented By: Eddie Lynn Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K J Hathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dravo Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Tank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maintenance Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmeuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maintenance Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Ratliff
Represented By: Ronald R Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethlehem Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Construction Company
Represented By: Mark Stanley Rains
Represented By: Brently C Olsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Maintenance Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Patrick Green
Represented By: Robert Lamar Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratliff, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald R Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Electric Co.
Represented By: Eric Anders Moen
Represented By: Bart Jay Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Norit Americas, Inc.
Represented By: John C Lennon
Represented By: Daniel J Hoehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norit Americas, Inc.
Represented By: John C Lennon
Represented By: Daniel J Hoehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&M Fabrication, Inc.
Represented By: Derrick Thad DeWitt
Represented By: Frederick Herman Sordahl, Jr
Represented By: Melanie Kay Dittrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmeuse Lime, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholaus Adam Hancock
Represented By: Andrew Bruce Morsman
Represented By: John R Woodard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Coppedge
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Represented By: Frank W Frasier, III
Represented By: Jerry Lynn Franks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Coppedge
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Represented By: Frank W Frasier, III
Represented By: Jerry Lynn Franks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?