Hartanovich v. Crew International, LLC
Plaintiff: Samantha Hartanovich
Defendant: Crew International, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00708
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Unopposed Motion for Additional Time for Defendant to Plead or Answer (Doc. 13) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due February 27, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/27/2020); granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Crew International, LLC (Woodard, John)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crew International, LLC (Woodard, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Crew International, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Plead or Answer (Doc. 9) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is due February 7, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/7/2020); granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Crew International, LLC (Woodard, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John R Woodard, III on behalf of Crew International, LLC [Note: Attorney John R Woodard, III added to party Crew International, LLC(pty:dft).] (Woodard, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholaus Adam Hancock on behalf of Crew International, LLC [Note: Attorney Nicholaus Adam Hancock added to party Crew International, LLC(pty:dft).] (Hancock, Nicholaus)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Bruce Morsman on behalf of Crew International, LLC [Note: Attorney Andrew Bruce Morsman added to party Crew International, LLC(pty:dft).] (Morsman, Andrew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Harry Anthony Parrish on behalf of Crew International, LLC [Note: Attorney Harry Anthony Parrish added to party Crew International, LLC(pty:dft).] (Parrish, Harry)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Bernard Federman on behalf of Samantha Hartanovich (Federman, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Crew International, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Crew International, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2153752) by Samantha Hartanovich (Federman, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Samantha Hartanovich (Federman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartanovich v. Crew International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Hartanovich
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crew International, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Bruce Morsman
Represented By: Harry Anthony Parrish
Represented By: John R Woodard, III
Represented By: Nicholaus Adam Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?