AgraSyst, Inc. et al v. Adjuvants Unlimited LLC
Plaintiff: AgraSyst, Inc. and AgQuam R&D, LLC
Defendant: Adjuvants Unlimited LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Amend and Supplement (Re: #2 Complaint ) by AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. (With attachments) (Cruz, Justin)
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Adjuvants Unlimited LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that defendant's unopposed motion #21 is granted. Defendant may file its answer or other responsive pleading no later than 3/10/2020 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/10/2020); granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
February 13, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent KFM Enterprises, LLC for Adjuvants Unlimited LLC) by Adjuvants Unlimited LLC (Nelson, Todd)
February 13, 2020 Filing 21 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Adjuvants Unlimited LLC (Nelson, Todd)
February 13, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott R Zingerman on behalf of Adjuvants Unlimited LLC [Note: Attorney Scott R Zingerman added to party Adjuvants Unlimited LLC(pty:dft).] (Zingerman, Scott)
February 13, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Todd Alan Nelson on behalf of Adjuvants Unlimited LLC [Note: Attorney Todd Alan Nelson added to party Adjuvants Unlimited LLC(pty:dft).] (Nelson, Todd)
February 3, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Shane Brunner on behalf of AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. [Note: Attorney Shane Brunner added to party AgQuam R&D, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Shane Brunner added to party AgraSyst, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Brunner, Shane)
January 31, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin R Cruz on behalf of AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. [Note: Attorney Justin R Cruz added to party AgQuam R&D, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Justin R Cruz added to party AgraSyst, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Cruz, Justin)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Adjuvants Unlimited LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by AgraSyst, Inc., AgQuam R&D, LLC (Oubre, Zachary)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (re Attys Justin R. Cruz and Shane A. Brunner for plaintiffs) ; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
January 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shane A. Brunner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2166731) by AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. (With attachments) (Oubre, Zachary)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin R. Cruz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2166720) by AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. (With attachments) (Oubre, Zachary)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael J LaBrie on behalf of AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. (LaBrie, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AgraSyst, Inc. (Oubre, Zachary)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AgQuam R&D, LLC (Oubre, Zachary)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Michael J LaBrie to file by 01/27/2020 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: incorrect PDF; Correction: corrected PDF (Re: #7 Report on Copyright/Patents/Trademarks ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/3/2020)to provide correct PDF (dlg, Dpty Clk).
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing AgraSyst, Inc and AgQuam R&D, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn John Bowman on behalf of AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Adjuvants Unlimited LLC (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Zachary A.P. Oubre on behalf of AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. (Oubre, Zachary)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Adjuvants Unlimited LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2157089) by AgraSyst, Inc., AgQuam R&D, LLC (With attachments) (Oubre, Zachary)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by AgQuam R&D, LLC, AgraSyst, Inc. (Oubre, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AgraSyst, Inc. et al v. Adjuvants Unlimited LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adjuvants Unlimited LLC
Represented By: Todd Alan Nelson
Represented By: Scott R Zingerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AgraSyst, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J LaBrie
Represented By: Zachary A.P. Oubre
Represented By: Jessica Lynn John Bowman
Represented By: Justin R Cruz
Represented By: Shane Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AgQuam R&D, LLC
Represented By: Michael J LaBrie
Represented By: Zachary A.P. Oubre
Represented By: Jessica Lynn John Bowman
Represented By: Justin R Cruz
Represented By: Shane Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?