Kemohah et al v. CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp.
Plaintiff: Theresa Marie Sanders, Jean Marie Kemohah, Noah Justin Kemohah, Mahada Berdadette Sanders, Adrian Kemohah Sanders and Thomas Kemohah, III
Defendant: CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00013
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 6/30/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 8/4/2020, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jean Marie Kemohah, Noah Justin Kemohah, Thomas Kemohah, III, Adrian Kemohah Sanders, Mahada Berdadette Sanders, Theresa Marie Sanders (Smith, Kenneth)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Utility Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent CenterPoint Energy, a Texas Corp for CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp.) by CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp. (Burgess, Bradley)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
February 4, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong attorney logged in to file appearance; Correction: changed text and added correct attorney to docket sheet (Re: #10 Appearance - Attorney ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 3/4/2020) (RGG, Chambers)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M Monty Hightower on behalf of All Defendants (Burgess, Bradley) Modified on 2/4/2020 to change text to reflect correct attorney appearing (sac, Dpty Clk).
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley W Burgess on behalf of All Defendants (Burgess, Bradley)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: #1 Complaint, ) by CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp. [Note: Attorney Bradley W Burgess added to party CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp.(pty:dft).] (Burgess, Bradley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp. (Re: #1 Complaint, ) by Thomas Kemohah, III, Jean Marie Kemohah, Theresa Marie Sanders, Adrian Kemohah Sanders, Mahada Berdadette Sanders, Noah Justin Kemohah (Smith, Kenneth)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Mitchell Bingham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bingham, Donald)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp. (alg, Dpty Clk)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kenneth Michael Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Kenneth)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jean Marie Kemohah, Noah Justin Kemohah, Thomas Kemohah, III, Adrian Kemohah Sanders, Mahada Berdadette Sanders, Theresa Marie Sanders (Smith, Kenneth)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M David Riggs on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Kenneth) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct attorney appearing (sac, Dpty Clk).
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2159457) by Thomas Kemohah, III, Jean Marie Kemohah, Theresa Marie Sanders, Adrian Kemohah Sanders, Mahada Berdadette Sanders, Noah Justin Kemohah (Smith, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemohah et al v. CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Marie Sanders
Represented By: Melvin David Riggs
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Smith
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Marie Kemohah
Represented By: Melvin David Riggs
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Smith
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Justin Kemohah
Represented By: Melvin David Riggs
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Smith
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahada Berdadette Sanders
Represented By: Melvin David Riggs
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Smith
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Kemohah Sanders
Represented By: Melvin David Riggs
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Smith
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kemohah, III
Represented By: Melvin David Riggs
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Smith
Represented By: Donald Mitchell Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenterPoint Energy Resources, Corp.
Represented By: Bradley W Burgess
Represented By: Manton Monty Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?