Mullinax v. City of Claremore, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Mullinax
Defendant: Nathan Turman, Bobby Hagen and City of Claremore, Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2020cv00089
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/18/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 1/4/2021, Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/29/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 4/19/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Rodney Mullinax (Smolen, Daniel)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/24/2020) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Murray Blakemore on behalf of Rodney Mullinax [Note: Attorney Robert Murray Blakemore added to party Rodney Mullinax(pty:pla).] (Blakemore, Robert)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by City of Claremore, Oklahoma, Bobby Hagen, Nathan Turman (Berkhouse, Jordan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordan L. Berkhouse on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Jordan L. Berkhouse added to party City of Claremore, Oklahoma(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan L. Berkhouse added to party Bobby Hagen(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan L. Berkhouse added to party Nathan Turman(pty:dft).] (Berkhouse, Jordan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party City of Claremore, Oklahoma(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party Bobby Hagen(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party Nathan Turman(pty:dft).] (LeBlanc, Thomas)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Nathan Turman (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rodney Mullinax (Smolen, Daniel)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bobby Hagen (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rodney Mullinax (Smolen, Daniel)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: City of Claremore, Oklahoma (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rodney Mullinax (Smolen, Daniel)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to City of Claremore, Oklahoma, Bobby Hagen, Nathan Turman (alg, Dpty Clk)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2181464) by Rodney Mullinax (Smolen, Daniel)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Rodney Mullinax (Smolen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullinax v. City of Claremore, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Turman
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Hagen
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Claremore, Oklahoma
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Mullinax
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Robert Murray Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?