Williams v. JEI Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justin Williams
Defendant: Starr Oilfield Services LLC, JEI Trucking LLC and Steven Nason
Case Number: 4:2020cv00137
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard C Downing (jjs, Dpty Clk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Samuel Brent Wakefield (jjs, Dpty Clk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 31 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Daniel Reece Owens (jjs, Dpty Clk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Stephen Rauls (jjs, Dpty Clk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Joshua Jon Sanford (jjs, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 20-CV-137-TCK-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing JEI Trucking LLC and Starr Oilfield Services LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2020 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Arkansas Eastern
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Court appreciates #24 status report. #23 Arkansas counsel's motion to withdraw is granted. #7 unopposed motion to transfer is granted. The Court directs the Clerk to transfer this case to the Northern District of Oklahoma now, rather than waiting the usual 30 days. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 03/31/2020. (ajt) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Justin Williams. (Sanford, Joshua) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw by JEI Trucking LLC (Wakefield, Samuel) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 motion for service as modified. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/2020. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Service by Publication and Motion for Extension of Time to Serve by Justin Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Attorney Josh Sanford, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Dawn Brownfield, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Gary Tramel, #4 Exhibit Proposed Warning Order)(Sanford, Joshua) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER:Motion, No. #19 , granted as modified. Williams must complete service on Nason by 18 March 2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/18/2020. (slb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 Third MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by Justin Williams (Sanford, Joshua) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Response, No. #15 , appreciated. The embedded request to hold this case in abeyance is granted. Joint status report due by 30 March 2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2020. (slb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Brent Wakefield on behalf of JEI Trucking LLC, Steven Nason (Wakefield, Samuel) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by JEI Trucking LLC (Owens, Daniel) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case Joint filed by JEI Trucking LLC, Steven Nason. (Owens, Daniel) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by JEI Trucking LLC, Steven Nason.(Owens, Daniel) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Reece Owens on behalf of JEI Trucking LLC, Steven Nason (Owens, Daniel) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #11 , granted as modified. Williams must complete service on Nason and JEI Trucking by 15 February 2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 01/16/2020. (crw) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by Justin Williams (Sanford, Joshua) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #9 , granted as modified. Williams must complete service of Nason and JEI Trucking by 15 January 2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2019. (slb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by Justin Williams (Sanford, Joshua) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot #5 Motion. #7 Motion to transfer will hang fire. JEI Trucking and Nason must respond to the joint motion when they answer. Williams must serve the motion on them when he serves them with the summons and complaint, or now, if process has already been served. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2019. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by Justin Williams (Sanford, Joshua) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Request to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1404(a) filed by Starr Oilfield Services LLC. (Downing, Richard) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Request to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1404(a) by Starr Oilfield Services LLC (Downing, Richard) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER granting Starr Oilfield Services LLC a 10 day extension to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/25/2019. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Downing on behalf of Starr Oilfield Services LLC (Downing, Richard) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Williams. Starr Oilfield Services LLC served on 9/5/2019. (Sanford, Joshua) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Justin Williams. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073670. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. JEI Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Williams
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEI Trucking LLC
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Nason
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?