Spry v. Holland
Plaintiff: Robert C Spry and Bob Spry
Defendant: Lanita Holland
Case Number: 4:2020cv00192
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss at Doc. #11 which should first be resolved. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Lanita Holland (With attachments) (Vaughan, Randall)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall Gene Vaughan on behalf of Lanita Holland [Note: Attorney Randall Gene Vaughan added to party Lanita Holland(pty:dft).] (Vaughan, Randall)
June 15, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong party selected regarding service; Correction: changed text to reflect correct party served (Re: #9 Summons Returned Executed ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
June 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Lanita Holland (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Robert C Spry (Mayo, William) Modified on 6/15/2020 to correct "re:" (sac, Dpty Clk).
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Robert C Spry (Mayo, William)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 MAIL to William Richard Mayo Returned - remailed on 5/19/2020 to Mayo Law Offices 1831 E 71st St Tulsa OK 74136 - Address obtained from contacting William Mayo.. (Re: #4 Summons Issued ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Robert C Spry (Mayo, William)
May 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Robert C Spry (Mayo, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Lanita Holland (alg, Dpty Clk)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Richard Mayo on behalf of Robert C Spry (Mayo, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Robert C Spry (Mayo, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert C Spry (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2203690) by Robert C Spry (With attachments) (Mayo, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spry v. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Spry
Represented By: William Richard Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Spry
Represented By: William Richard Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanita Holland
Represented By: Randall Gene Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?