Mathews et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Dewayne Mathews and Debra Turner
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Petitioner: Rodney A. Max
Case Number: 4:2020cv00200
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 37 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Dale A Evans, JR (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Phillip Russel Perdew (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 35 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Patrick A Barthle, II (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to John Allen Yanchunis, Sr. (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 20-CV-00200-CVE-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PHH Mortgage Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 31 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Florida Southern
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER DE #6 . The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma. Upon transfer, the Clerk shall CLOSE this case and terminate any pending motions as MOOT. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Rodney A. Max as Mediator. (Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Evans, Dale) Modified text on 1/16/2020 (kpe). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 01/07/2020 before Judge Kenneth A. Marra, 1-30 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2020. (sf) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 8/13/2021 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra: Status Conference held on 1/7/2020. Total time in court: 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): John Allen Yanchunis, Sr, Patrick A Barthle, II, Dale A Evans, Jr, Phillip Russell Perdew. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 Amended REPLY to #11 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending The Outcome of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to #11 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending The Outcome of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending The Outcome of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Dewayne Mathews, Debra Turner. Replies due by 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Phillip Russell Perdew. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/26/2019. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Dewayne Mathews, Debra Turner. Replies due by 12/27/2019. (Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Dewayne Mathews, Debra Turner. Replies due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Phillip Russell Perdew. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12243411 by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 1/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference: Status Conference Re: Case Management/Posture Matters set for 1/7/2020 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending The Outcome of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Dewayne Mathews, Debra Turner (Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation, #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 12/20/2019. Replies due by 1/15/2020. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/5/2019. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION to Change Venue , #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Dewayne Mathews, Debra Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Dale A Evans, Jr on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Bradford D. Barron, mailing date November 4, 2019, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Dewayne Mathews and Debra Turner, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated v. PHH Mortgage Corporation, a New Jersey corporation and successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, a limited liability corporation organized under the laws of the state of Florida) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12115728, filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation, a New Jersey corporation and successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, a limited liability corporation organized under the laws of the state of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Evans, Dale) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/11/2020.]
September 11, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against PHH Mortgage Corporation by Dewayne Mathews, Debra Turner (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathews et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Mathews
Represented By: Bradford D Barron
Represented By: Patrick A Barthle, II
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Turner
Represented By: Patrick A Barthle, II
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Dale A Evans, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip Russell Perdew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodney A. Max
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?